Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Josef Hannibal Petazzi de Castel Nuovo

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1703Born
6 Jul 172622.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
7 Jul 172622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
27 Aug 174037.1SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
30 Sep 174037.1ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
8 Jan 174137.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
22 Sep 176057.1SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
15 Dec 176057.4ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
25 Jan 176157.5InstalledBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
22 Nov 177269.3DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Leopold Josef Hannibal Petazzi de Castel Nuovo
Bishop Leopold Josef Hannibal Petazzi de Castel Nuovo (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 249, and Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast