Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Bellomi

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1929Born
8 Jul 195122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
17 Oct 197748.7AppointedBishop of Trieste, Italy
27 Nov 197748.8Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
23 Aug 199667.6DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Bellomi
Bishop Lorenzo Bellomi (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Lucia Extra

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast