Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guido Pozzo

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

Titular Archbishop of Balneoregium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1951 Born
24 Sep 197725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
8 Jul 200957.5AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
3 Nov 201260.8AppointedAlmoner of the Office of Papal Charities
3 Nov 201260.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Balneoregium
17 Nov 201260.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Balneoregium
3 Aug 201361.6AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
19 Jan 201967.0CeasedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

MicroData Summary for Guido Pozzo (VIAF: 85177897)
Archbishop Guido Pozzo (born ) Secretary Emeritus of “Ecclesia Dei”

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrieste, Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Trieste, Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Damaso, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,604
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Aug 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2019
  • c3/loc: AM, 10 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast