Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Miller

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1638³Born
166930.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trieste, Italy
20 Dec 169153.3SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
6 Oct 169254.1ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
7 Dec 169254.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
23 Apr 172081.7DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Miller
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Miller (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorizia

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast