Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophorus von Raubar (Rauber)

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana

Bishop of Seckau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1476²BornTrieste
1 May 149317.3SelectedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
28 Feb 149418.2ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
1509²33.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Seckau, Austria
15 Feb 151236.1SucceededBishop of Seckau, Austria
1519²43.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
26 Oct 153660.8DiedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christophorus von Raubar (Rauber):
Bishop Christophorus von Raubar (Rauber) (died ) Bishop of Ljubljana

  • a bishop for 17.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 217, and Page 295
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 171
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,910

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014