Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Sartorius Delmestri von Schönberg

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1679³Born
18 Oct 171132.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trieste, Italy
18 Oct 172344.3SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
26 Jun 172445.0ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
10 Dec 172445.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
6 Nov 173960.3DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucas Sartorius Delmestri von Schönberg
Bishop Lucas Sartorius Delmestri von Schönberg (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCormoni

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast