Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm von Leslie

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657¹Born
23 Mar 168124.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien, Austria
5 Apr 168124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Wien, Austria
22 Feb 171053.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Trieste, Italy
18 Dec 171154.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Trieste, Italy
18 Dec 171154.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
6 Mar 171255.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
16 Apr 171659.2SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
5 Oct 171659.7ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
5 Jan 171861.0SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
6 Apr 171861.2ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
24 Jul 171861.5InstalledBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
4 Apr 172770.2DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Leslie (VIAF: 80967103)
Bishop Wilhelm von Leslie (born 1657, died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEcosse

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 65, and Page 233
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 371, and Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast