Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeo Coronini

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹BornPrebacina Gradiscutta
21 Apr 162544.3AppointedBishop of Pedena, Austria
27 Jan 163150.0AppointedBishop of Trieste, Italy
14 Mar 164665.2DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Coronini:
Bishop Pompeo Coronini (died ) Bishop of Trieste

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 277, and Page 330
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015