Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Fogar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1882Born
23 Jul 190725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
9 Jul 192341.4AppointedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
14 Oct 192341.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
6 Mar 192442.1InstalledBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
30 Oct 193654.7ResignedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
30 Oct 193654.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
26 Aug 197189.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Fogar
Archbishop Luigi Fogar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePevma

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 47.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast