Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mihael Toros

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

Apostolic Administrator of Poreč i Pula

Titular See: (AA of the portions in Slovenia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1884Born
1910²25.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 194762.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
28 Feb 194863.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
1955²70.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
1961²76.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
29 Dec 196379.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mihael Toros
Father Mihael Toros (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Gorizia e Gradisca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedana, Slovenia
Death PlaceKostanjevica (near Nova Gorica), Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca

  • a priest for 53.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 16 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 Jun 2020

Quantcast