Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Parragues de Castillejo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1549AppointedBishop of Trieste, Italy
4 Nov 1558AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
23 Feb 1573DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Parragues de Castillejo (VIAF: 89315768)
Archbishop Antonio Parragues de Castillejo O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad Rodrigo, Diocese of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1,500, Page 62, Number 351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 310, and Page 146
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 27*
  • b: AT, 22 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast