Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josip Pavlišić

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1914Born
2 Apr 193823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
13 Dec 195136.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
13 Dec 195136.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bruzus
13 Jan 195237.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bruzus
20 Aug 196954.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
20 Aug 196954.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petina
18 Apr 197459.3SucceededArchbishop of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
5 Jan 199075.0RetiredArchbishop of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
9 Dec 200590.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia

MicroData Summary
Josip Pavlišić
Archbishop Josip Pavlišić
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Rijeka-Senj

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStari Pazin, Diocese of Poreč i Pula
Ordained BishopSaint Nicolas, Church, Pazin
Death PlaceRijeka, Archdiocese of Rijeka-Senj

  • a priest for 67.6 years
  • a bishop for 53.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 2
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • opd: CB, 29 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025