Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Metod Pirih

Bishop Emeritus of Koper, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1936 Born
29 Jun 196327.1Ordained PriestPriest of Koper, Slovenia
25 Mar 198548.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Koper, Slovenia
27 May 198549.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Koper, Slovenia
16 Apr 198750.9SucceededBishop of Koper, Slovenia
26 May 201276.0RetiredBishop of Koper, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Metod Pirih
Bishop Metod Pirih (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Koper

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLokovec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Koper.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast