Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matevž (Matteo) Ravnikar (Raunicher)

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1776BornVazhe
27 Jul 180225.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Jul 180225.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 183053.9SelectedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
30 Sep 183155.0ConfirmedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
18 Dec 183155.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
20 Nov 184569.1DiedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy

MicroData Summary for Matevž (Matteo) Ravnikar (Raunicher) (VIAF: 90506140)
Bishop Matevž (Matteo) Ravnikar (Raunicher) (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,529
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016