Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Cajetanus von Buset zu Faistenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1745³Born
25 Jul 176721.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
14 Jul 176822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
12 Feb 179650.5SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
27 Jun 179650.8ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
23 Oct 179651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
19 Sep 180358.1DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Cajetanus von Buset zu Faistenberg
Bishop Ignatius Cajetanus von Buset zu Faistenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRaka-Arch, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Trieste, Diocese of Trieste

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 397
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,703

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 5 Jul 2020

Quantcast