Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Leonardis da Lucinico

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1756BornGorizia
25 Apr 177922.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
29 May 177923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
4 Mar 182164.7SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
13 Aug 182165.2ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
6 Jan 182265.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
14 Jan 183073.6DiedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Leonardis da Lucinico
Bishop Antonio Leonardis da Lucinico (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016