Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius von Herberstein, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1725BornWien
16 Jun 175024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
22 Jan 176034.0SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
6 Apr 176135.2ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
2 Dec 177448.9DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonius von Herberstein:
Bishop Antonius von Herberstein C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste

  • a priest for 24.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015