Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrija Marija Sterk

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1827BornVelosca d'Istria
21 Sep 185325.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 185325.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 189466.2SelectedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
18 May 189466.5ConfirmedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
24 Jun 189466.6Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
25 Jun 189668.6AppointedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
17 Sep 190173.8DiedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrija Marija Sterk:
Bishop Andrija Marija Sterk (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 541, and Page 584

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013