Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Abad Huerta

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornCubel
13 Jul 164464.5AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
27 Dec 164465.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
16 May 164666.4DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Abad Huerta:
Bishop Domingo Abad Huerta (died ) Bishop of Teruel

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 331
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013