Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Chueca

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹BornCálcena
23 Apr 164251.3SelectedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
13 Jul 164352.5ConfirmedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
14 Mar 164453.2Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
3 Dec 164655.9SelectedBishop of Teruel, Spain
6 May 164756.3ConfirmedBishop of Teruel, Spain
18 Jun 167281.5DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Chueca:
Bishop Diego Chueca (died ) Bishop of Teruel

  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 331, and Page 110
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 173, Number 1,074

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014