Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Rodríguez Rico

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1772Born
22 Jun 182552.7SelectedBishop of Teruel, Spain
19 Dec 182553.2ConfirmedBishop of Teruel, Spain
9 Apr 182653.5Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
21 May 182754.6AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
12 Jan 184168.3DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Rodríguez Rico
Bishop Jacinto Rodríguez Rico (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillamayor de Campos

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 159, and Page 363
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,377
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 144, Number 779
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast