Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Rodríguez Chico

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1707Born
26 Sep 175750.2AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
13 Nov 175750.3Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
21 Mar 178072.7DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Rodríguez Chico
Bishop Francisco José Rodríguez Chico (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNava del Rey

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 76, Number 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,757, Number 48
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast