Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Cortés de Sangüesa

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1551¹Born
4 Jul 160756.5AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
27 Aug 161463.6AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
9 Dec 162473.9DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Cortés de Sangüesa
Bishop Tomás Cortés de Sangüesa (born 1551, died ) Bishop of Teruel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuesca

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 123, Number 785
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205, and Page 331
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast