Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Urbano Cardinal Navarrete Cortés, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Ponziano

Priest of Society of Jesus

Titular See: (Rector Emeritus of the Pontifical Gregorian University)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1920Born
31 May 195232.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Nov 200787.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200787.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Ponziano
13 Jan 200887.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Ponziano
22 Nov 201090.4DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

MicroData Summary for Urbano Navarrete Cortés (VIAF: 9840111)
Urbano Cardinal Navarrete Cortés S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Ponziano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamarena de la Sierra, Spain

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018