Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Apaolaza Ramírez, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1567³BornMoyuela
24 Aug 162255.1AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
30 Apr 162557.8SelectedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
18 Jul 162558.0ConfirmedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
8 Aug 163366.1AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
8 Jan 163567.5AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
21 Jun 164376.0DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Apaolaza Ramírez:
Archbishop Pedro Apaolaza Ramírez O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 74, and Page 109
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 126
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013