Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Javier de Lizana y Beaumont

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1749BornArnedo de la Rioja, Spain
18 Dec 179546.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
18 Dec 179546.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
21 Feb 179646.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
11 Aug 180050.6AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
24 May 180252.4AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
27 Dec 180253.0InstalledArchbishop of México, Federal District
6 Mar 181565.2DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier de Lizana y Beaumont (VIAF: 4796510)
Archbishop Francisco Javier de Lizana y Beaumont (born , died ) Archbishop of México

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 263, and Page 363
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 399
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 114, Number 597
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016