Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roque Martín Merino

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1726Born
11 Dec 178054.6AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
18 Feb 178154.8Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
6 Nov 179468.6DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

MicroData Summary for Roque Martín Merino
Bishop Roque Martín Merino (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuentes de D. Bermudo

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 98, Number 505
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast