Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Aznar y Naves, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612²Born
19 Sep 163220.7ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
15 Jan 166351.0AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
16 Nov 167159.8AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
20 Sep 167361.7SelectedBishop of Teruel, Spain
16 Apr 167462.2ConfirmedBishop of Teruel, Spain
7 May 168270.3DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Aznar y Naves (VIAF: 22389196)
Bishop Andrés Aznar y Naves O.S.A. (born 1612, died ) Bishop of Teruel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopSan Agustín, Convent, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceBueña, Diocese of Teruel

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 223, and Page 372
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 196, Number 1,233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,810

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Sep 2020

Quantcast