Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Zolivera

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638BornBarbastro
22 Feb 167234.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarragona, Spain
22 Feb 167234.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
May 1672³34.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
27 Sep 168244.7SelectedBishop of Teruel, Spain
11 Jan 168345.0ConfirmedBishop of Teruel, Spain
28 Mar 170062.2DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Zolivera:
Bishop Jerónimo Zolivera (died ) Bishop of Teruel

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 209, Number 1,304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013