Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Pérez Baroja y Muro

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1701Born
17 Nov 175554.6AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
18 Jan 175654.8Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
29 Mar 175756.0DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Pérez Baroja y Muro
Bishop Francisco Javier Pérez Baroja y Muro (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArtol

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,524
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 73, Number 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast