Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paula Moreno y Andreu

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1809BornPurchena
12 Sep 187667.3SelectedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
29 Sep 187667.4ConfirmedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
10 Dec 187667.6Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
11 Jun 188071.1DiedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Moreno y Andreu:
Bishop Francisco de Paula Moreno y Andreu (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013