Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Asensio Ocón y Toledo

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1773³BornAlbarracín
1807¹33.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Aug 182854.9SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
15 Dec 182855.2ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
26 Apr 182955.5Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
26 Nov 183158.1SelectedBishop of Teruel, Spain
24 Feb 183258.4ConfirmedBishop of Teruel, Spain
2 Dec 183360.1DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Asensio Ocón y Toledo:
Bishop José Asensio Ocón y Toledo (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel

  • a priest for 26.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,224
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 296, and Page 363
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 146, Number 793

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013