Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Estalella y Sivilla

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1844Born
21 May 189449.6AppointedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
9 Sep 189449.9Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
22 Apr 189651.6DiedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Estalella y Sivilla (VIAF: 282650491)
Bishop Antonio Estalella y Sivilla (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca del Panadés, Diocese of Barcelona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 543
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017