Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Fogued y Gil, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Prefect of Tunxi [Tunki], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1885Born
190317.2ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
23 Jun 191226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
14 Apr 193751.5AppointedPrefect of Tunxi [Tunki], China
24 Jan 195468.3DiedPrefect of Tunxi [Tunki], China

MicroData Summary for José Fogued y Gil
Father José Fogued y Gil C.M.F. (born , died ) Prefect of Tunxi [Tunki]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOjos Negros, Diocese of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
Death PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain

  • a priest for 41.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,951
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast