Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime José Soler y Roquer

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1799Born
1824¹24.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 184950.0SelectedBishop of Teruel, Spain
20 May 185050.6ConfirmedBishop of Teruel, Spain
6 Oct 185051.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
21 Mar 185151.4DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime José Soler y Roquer
Bishop Jaime José Soler y Roquer (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan de las Abadesas, Diocese of Vic
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vic, Diocese of Vic

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 542
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 159, Number 873
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,850, Number 49
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 594

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast