Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victoriano Guisasola y Rodríguez

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1821Born
16 Jan 187452.4AppointedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
24 Jan 187553.4Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
12 Sep 187655.0SelectedTitular Bishop of Dora
29 Sep 187655.1ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Dora
28 May 187755.7AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
16 Dec 188160.3SelectedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
27 Mar 188260.6ConfirmedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
10 Jun 188664.8AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
20 Jan 188866.4DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Victoriano Guisasola y Rodríguez (VIAF: 251711309)
Archbishop Victoriano Guisasola y Rodríguez (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviedo
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 219, and Page 250
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 427, and Page 542
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,868, Page 40, Number 7
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,875, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast