Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel 聲gel del Prado C嫫denas

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1802BornIrupana
24 Aug 182624.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Aug 182624.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 184643.9AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
13 Dec 184644.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
28 Sep 185553.6AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
Sep 1858³56.5DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel 聲gel del Prado C嫫denas:
Archbishop Manuel 聲gel del Prado C嫫denas (born ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 459
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013