Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Rivero Rivero

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre

Titular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1876BornSanta Cruz de la Sierra
8 Jan 189923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
17 May 192246.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
17 May 192246.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
9 Jul 192246.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
30 Mar 193155.2SucceededBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
3 Feb 194064.1AppointedArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia
26 Oct 195175.8RetiredArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia
26 Oct 195175.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
23 May 196084.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sucre, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Daniel Rivero Rivero:
Archbishop Daniel Rivero Rivero (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013