Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel de los Santos Taborga

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1833BornSucre
11 Jan 185723.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 189864.7AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
8 May 189864.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
12 Dec 190572.4DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Miguel de los Santos Taborga:
Archbishop Miguel de los Santos Taborga (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 459
  • ob/op/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013