Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jesús Juárez Párraga, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1943 Born
16 Dec 197229.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Apr 198844.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
16 Apr 198844.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
18 Jun 198844.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
25 Jun 199450.9AppointedBishop of El Alto, Bolivia
2 Feb 201369.5AppointedArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia
20 Mar 201369.6InstalledArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia
11 Feb 202076.5RetiredArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jesús Juárez Párraga
Archbishop Jesús Juárez Párraga S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlquerias, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, La Paz, Archdiocese of La Paz

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sucre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,723
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013
  • i: CB, 20 Mar 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 31 Mar 2020

Quantcast