Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Nava Carreón

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sucre, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Thizica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1923Born
11 Jun 195026.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 196945.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sucre, Bolivia
26 May 196945.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thizica
2 Aug 196945.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thizica
9 Aug 198460.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Sucre, Bolivia
18 Mar 199066.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sucre, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Nava Carreón
Bishop Alfonso Nava Carreón (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sucre

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadilla

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast