Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Garret

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1888BornSucre
20 Dec 191123.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
13 Nov 192435.9AppointedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
15 Mar 192536.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
28 Dec 192941.0ResignedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
19 Apr 196879.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Julio Garret:
Bishop Julio Garret (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 6 Mar 2012
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1925, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013