Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Antonio Navarro Martín de Villodras

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1759BornMoclín, Spain
1785¹25.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 180647.5AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
10 Sep 180950.5Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
8 Apr 181051.1InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
5 Oct 181758.6SelectedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
16 Mar 181859.1ConfirmedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
1827¹67.8DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Antonio Navarro Martín de Villodras:
Archbishop Diego Antonio Navarro Martín de Villodras (born ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 12
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 159, and Page 310
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 128, Number 687

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015