Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristóbal de Castilla y Zamora

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618²Born
11 Jun 166850.4AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
Jan 1669³51.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
8 Nov 167759.8AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
7 Dec 168365.9DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal de Castilla y Zamora
Archbishop Cristóbal de Castilla y Zamora (born 1618, died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucena

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 217, and Page 317
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 204, Number 1,275
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast