Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Arce Mostajo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Auxiliary Bishop of Sucre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1897Born
10 Sep 192225.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 194043.5AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
16 Feb 194143.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
22 May 195861.0ResignedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
22 May 195861.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sucre, Bolivia
22 May 195861.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
26 Nov 197073.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
9 Jan 198486.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Augustin Arce Mostajo
Bishop Augustin Arce Mostajo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSucre

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast