Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ricardo Ernesto Centellas Guzmán

Archbishop of Sucre, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1962 Born
11 Aug 198825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sucre, Bolivia
30 Jun 200542.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Potosí, Bolivia
30 Jun 200542.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae
15 Sep 200542.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae
25 Nov 200947.0AppointedBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
28 Jan 201047.2InstalledBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
11 Feb 202057.2AppointedArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia
16 Jun 202057.6InstalledArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Ernesto Centellas Guzmán
Archbishop Ricardo Ernesto Centellas Guzmán (born ) Archbishop of Sucre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSuquistaca, Archdiocese of Sucre
Ordained BishopSan Antonio de Padua, Basilica, Potosi, Diocese of Potosí

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sucre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,973
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2020
  • i: CB, 14 Feb 2020
  • i: CB, 16 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Jun 2020

Quantcast