Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Tarcisio Senner, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1895Born
16 Nov 191924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Feb 194246.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chiquitos, Bolivia
25 Feb 194246.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusadus
29 Jun 194246.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusadus
1948²52.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sucre, Bolivia
26 Oct 195156.2AppointedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
19 Aug 196570.0ResignedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
19 Aug 196570.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Equizetum
23 Jan 197680.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Equizetum
28 Apr 198589.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cochabamba, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Tarcisio Senner
Bishop Juan Tarcisio Senner O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMusan, Austria

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast