Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Campos Julián, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note/Previous Titular See: (José Antonio de San Alberto)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1727³Born
30 Jul 177851.4SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
28 Sep 177851.6ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
17 Sep 178053.5Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
30 Oct 178053.7InstalledBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
20 Sep 178962.5AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
25 Mar 180477.1DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Campos Julián
Archbishop José Campos Julián O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Frasno, Spain
Ordained BishopBuenos Aires, Diocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 96, Number 497
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341, and Page 420
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast