Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Francesco Pierini, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sucre, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1871Born
21 Nov 189019.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
24 Oct 189322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
23 Feb 189422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Feb 191846.3AppointedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
30 May 191846.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
31 Oct 192352.0AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
28 Oct 193968.0DiedArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Luigi Francesco Pierini
Archbishop Luigi Francesco Pierini O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sucre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnaia, Italy

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast