Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cayetano Marcellano y Agramont

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1697¹Born
23 Jan 174952.0SelectedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
21 Apr 174952.3ConfirmedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
2 Aug 175053.5Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
23 May 175760.3AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
13 Mar 175861.1AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
28 Aug 176063.6DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Marcellano y Agramont
Archbishop Cayetano Marcellano y Agramont (born 1697, died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuzco

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341, and Page 417
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast